Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/28/2021 at 05:02:18 (UTC).

KBR Inc dba Rash Curtis & Associates vs Knight, Ronnie et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 KBR Inc dba Rash Curtis Associates filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Knight, Ronnie. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1084

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Butte County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KBR Inc dba Rash Curtis & Associates

Defendants

Knight, Ronnie L, Jr.

Knight, Tina

Knight, Ronnie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oliveira, Duane Steven

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

06/03/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ronnie Knight

05/27/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to Ronnie Knight

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Tina Knight

05/18/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Tina Knight

Complaint

04/29/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

04/29/2021: Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Ronnie Knight; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Ronnie Knight

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Tina Knight

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: Common Counts; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $3839.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 05/20/2021; Served: 05/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KBR Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oliveira, Duane S