This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 07:49:43 (UTC).

Johnson, Tait C vs Lucito Insurance Agency, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 Johnson, Tait C filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Lucito Insurance Agency, Inc. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glusman, Robert A, Mosbarger, Tamara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3892

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

Judge Details

Judges

Glusman, Robert A

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnson, Tait C.

Johnson, Tait C

Defendants

Lucito, Julieann

Lucito Insurance Agency, Inc.

Lucito Insurance Agency, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Griffith, David Richard

Defendant Attorney

Robertson, Daniel William

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/03/2018: Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Julieann Lucito

03/15/2019: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Julieann Lucito

Civil Minutes

06/05/2019: Civil Minutes

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

12/05/2018: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Notice of Rescheduled Case Management Conference

12/27/2018: Notice of Rescheduled Case Management Conference

Summons

12/03/2018: Summons

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

09/11/2019: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/03/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Minutes

10/09/2019: Civil Minutes

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

07/07/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

07/07/2020: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Notice of Rescheduling

12/04/2019: Notice of Rescheduling

Civil Minutes

10/09/2019: Civil Minutes

Defendants' Case Management Statement

09/24/2019: Defendants' Case Management Statement

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

09/11/2019: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

06/05/2019: Civil Minutes

Case Management Statement

05/21/2019: Case Management Statement

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

05/10/2019: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Judicial Officer: Glusman, Robert A; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Time Estimate of Five Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Judicial Officer: Glusman, Robert A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSettlement Conference; Notice of Rescheduling; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal; Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketJury Deposit - Non Refundable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Defendants' Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Glusman, Robert A; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 06/05/19; Plaintiff; Attorney: Griffith, David Richard; Defendant; Attorney: Robertson, Daniel William; Defendant; Attorney: Robertson, Daniel William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Defendants' Case Management Statement; Comment: Defendants' Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Julieann Lucito; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Julieann Lucito

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance; Comment: Defendant s Answer to Plaintiff s Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Rescheduled Case Management Conference; Comment: Notice of Rescheduled Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 12/18/2018; Served: 12/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Glusman, Robert A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: 1 Negligence; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 12/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel William Robertson