This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:02:29 (UTC).

Jenkins, Ashley vs Chue, Wang Long

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Jenkins, Ashley filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Chue, Wang Long. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Keithley, Clare, Gingery, Virginia and McLean, Sandra L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0710

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

Judge Details

Judges

Gingery, Virginia

McLean, Sandra L

Keithley, Clare

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jenkins, Ashley

Respondent

Chue, Wang Long

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: Petitioner Filed 6-20-2022 Temporary Order Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Declaration and Responsive Declaration as to Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of DV-120 and FL-155 as to Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketResponse to Request for Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Firearms Turned In, Sold or Stored

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing DV116; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing and Reissue TRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Unsuccessful Service of Temporary Restraining Order as to Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Assignment; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Domestic Violence; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Comment: Notice of Court Hearing - Temporary Order Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketReq for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF)

    Read MoreRead Less