This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 02:51:36 (UTC).

In the Matter of: Shane George Carreon

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 In the Matter of Shane George Carreon was filed as a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******47-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Carreon, Shane George

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Caraway, Christopher W.

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: Time Estimate: 2 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketTrial Assignment Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Comment: Time Estimate: 2 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Time Estimate: 2 Days (PC1368)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - Limited; Comment: Limited Time Waiver to 10/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMental Competence Hearing; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Confirming Appointment of Dr. Stembridge for PC1368 Evaluation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDoctor's Report after Examination - PC1368; Comment: Report from Dr. Stembridge pursuant to PC1368- Original.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: Report from Dr. Stembridge pursuant to PC1368-Faxed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketReport; Comment: Report from Dr. Stembridge pursuant to PC1368-Faxed

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: C. Caraway

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMental Competence Hearing; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Receipt of PC1368 Report from Dr. Switzer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: PC1368 Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketReport; Comment: from Dr. Switzer Pursuant to PC1368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: Report from Dr. Switzer pursuant to PC1368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDoctor's Report after Examination - PC1368; Comment: Report from Dr. Switzer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketSheriff's Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: PC1368 Referral Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketOrder of Examination - PC1368; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caraway, Christopher W.