This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/04/2022 at 22:33:40 (UTC).

In the Matter of: Raul Anthony Cabral, Jr.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 In the Matter of Raul Anthony Cabral, Jr was filed as a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chandler, Christopher R and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******17-1

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chandler, Christopher R

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Cabral, Raul Anthony, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Judgment Type: Criminal Proceedings Reinstated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketMental Competence Hearing; Judicial Officer: Chandler, Christopher R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Receipt of PC1368 report from Dr. Wuehler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: Report of Dr. Wuehler pursuant to PC1368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDoctor's Report after Examination - PC1368; Comment: Report of Dr. Wuehler- Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketOrder of Examination - PC1368; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bently, Matthew Cristopher