This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/21/2022 at 10:18:35 (UTC).

In the matter of Jonathon Pearson

Case Summary

On 04/22/2016 In the matter of Jonathon Pearson was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P, Glusman, Robert A and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0493

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

Glusman, Robert A

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

C.S. Collections

Respondent

Pearson, Jonathon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gill, Sanpreet

 

Court Documents

Notice

04/29/2016: Notice

Civil Minutes

05/20/2016: Civil Minutes

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/22/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice

05/16/2016: Notice

Petition - No Fee

04/22/2016: Petition - No Fee

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order/Ruling

07/05/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order/Ruling

Declaration

04/29/2016: Declaration

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

05/06/2016: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Hearing

04/22/2016: Notice of Hearing

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling; Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order/Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: The petition for approval is denied. The Court does not find this to be in the best interest of the applicant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 9:05 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights by & between Jonathon Pearson & CS Collections, LLC, pursuant to California Insurance Code section 10134, et seq; Petitioner; Attorney: Gill, Sanpreet; Respondent: Pearson, Jonathon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comment: of Statutorily Executed Transfer Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comment: of Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: of Britney Gaviria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: of Petition for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - No Fee; Comment: for Approval for Transfer of Structured Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.S. COLLECTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILL, SANPREET