This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/25/2022 at 19:06:23 (UTC).

In the Matter of: Christopher Joseph Collette

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 In the Matter of Christopher Joseph Collette was filed as a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Giordano, Raymond J, Rodriguez, Jesus A and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******95-1

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Giordano, Raymond J

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Collette, Christopher Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Bently, Matthew Cristopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketPlacement Hearing; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Placement Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketMental Health-Firearms Restriction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketUnder Supervision

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketMental Competence Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Report from Dr. Switzer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDoctor's Report after Examination - PC1368; Comment: Dr. Switzer Report Pursuant to PC1368

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketMental Competence Hearing; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Receipt of PC1368 Report from Dr. Switzer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSheriff's Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketOrder of Examination - PC1368; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bently, Matthew Cristopher