This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 15:02:21 (UTC).

In the Matter of: Ashley Marie Coccellato

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 In the Matter of Ashley Marie Coccellato was filed as a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******89-1

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Coccellato, Ashley Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Henson, Saul W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketMental Competence Hearing; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Receipt of PC1368 Report from Dr. Switzer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: Report PC1368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketReport; Comment: Report of Dr. Switzer pursuant to PC1368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSheriff's Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: PC1368 Referral Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketOrder of Examination - PC1368; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henson, Saul W