This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 08:33:37 (UTC).

In re: O'Rear, Rickie

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 In re O'Rear, Rickie was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2835

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

O'Rear, Rickie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Power, Stacie Lynn

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/01/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Decree of Change Of Name

12/01/2022: Petition for Decree of Change Of Name

Order to Show Cause Re Name Change

12/05/2022: Order to Show Cause Re Name Change

Background Check Results Received

12/20/2022: Background Check Results Received

Affidavit of Publication

01/31/2023: Affidavit of Publication

Decree Changing Name

01/31/2023: Decree Changing Name

Proof of Mailing

01/31/2023: Proof of Mailing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Order to Show Cause Re Name Change; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree; Decree Changing Name; Comment: Decree Changing Name

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit; Affidavit of Publication; Comment: Affidavit of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBackground Check Results Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketBackground Check Requested from Law Enforcement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Name Change; Order to Show Cause Re Name Change; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Decree of Change Of Name

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less