This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 05:02:57 (UTC).

In re: Charles W Foote III

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 In re Charles W Foote III was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0777

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Foote, Charles W, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Suk, Adam

Toschi, Steven Craig

 

Court Documents

Notice of Foote's Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purpose of Preserving Evidence

04/14/2022: Notice of Foote's Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purpose of Preserving Evidence

Foote's Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purposes of Preserving Evidence

04/14/2022: Foote's Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purposes of Preserving Evidence

Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery

04/14/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery

Proof of Service

04/22/2022: Proof of Service

Civil Minutes

05/11/2022: Civil Minutes

Proof of Service

05/13/2022: Proof of Service

Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Petition for Pre-suit Discovery

05/20/2022: Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Petition for Pre-suit Discovery

Opposition to Charles w Foote III's Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery

05/23/2022: Opposition to Charles w Foote III's Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery

Civil Minutes

05/25/2022: Civil Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purposes of Preserving Evidence is DENIED. The Petition is moot in light of the fact there is now a pending case, case# 22CV00984.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Petition for Pre-suit Discovery; Opposition to Charles w Foote III's Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery Purposes of Preserving Evidence; Continued 05/11/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - No Fee; Opposition to Charles w Foote III's Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery; Comment: Opposition to Charles w Foote III's Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purposes of Preserving Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply; Petitioner's Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Petition for Pre-suit Discovery; Comment: Reply to Respondent's Opposition to Petition for Pre-suit Discovery for Purposes of Preserving Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purposes of Preserving Evidence is continued to May 25, 2022 at 9:00am. Although the Court is in receipt of the proof of service as to one of the respondents, Bruce Watson, there is no proof of service as to the other respondent, Jessica Zavala-Becerra.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Notice of Foote's Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purpose of Preserving Evidence; Foote's Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purposes of Preserving Evidence; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purposes of Preserving Evidence; Petitioner; Attorney: Suk, Adam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery; Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - No Fee; Foote's Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purposes of Preserving Evidence; Comment: Foote's Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purposes of Preserving Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Foote's Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purpose of Preserving Evidence; Comment: Notice of Foote's Verified Petition for Pre-Suit Discovery for Purpose of Preserving Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOSCHI STEVEN CRAIG