This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/30/2022 at 16:12:26 (UTC).

In re: Chaplin, Kyleigh Laurynn

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 In re Chaplin, Kyleigh Laurynn was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benson, Stephen E and Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2886

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

Judge Details

Judges

Benson, Stephen E

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Chaplin, Kyleigh Laurynn

 

Court Documents

Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement

12/01/2021: Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement

Civil Minutes

01/19/2022: Civil Minutes

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name

11/30/2021: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name

Background Check Results Received

12/02/2021: Background Check Results Received

Proof of Mailing

05/10/2022: Proof of Mailing

Order Dismissing Action

05/09/2022: Order Dismissing Action

Civil Minutes

05/04/2022: Civil Minutes

Civil Minutes

03/23/2022: Civil Minutes

Civil Minutes

01/19/2022: Civil Minutes

Background Check Results Received

12/02/2021: Background Check Results Received

Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement

12/01/2021: Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name

11/30/2021: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name

Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

11/24/2021: Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Decree of Change Of Name

11/24/2021: Petition for Decree of Change Of Name

Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

11/24/2021: Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Decree of Change Of Name

11/24/2021: Petition for Decree of Change Of Name

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: If proper proof of publication is submitted at or before the hearing, the Petition will be granted. If proof of publication has not been submitted and there is no appearance by the Petitioner, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Name Change Continued from 03/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: If proper proof of publication is submitted at or before the hearing, the Petition will be granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for Change of Name; Continued to allow for Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: If proper proof of publication is submitted at or before the hearing, the Petition will be granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Petition for Decree of Change Of Name; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Order to Show Cause for Change of Name; Background Check Requested from Law Enforcement; Background Check Results Received; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for Name Change; Petitioner: Chaplin, Kyleigh Laurynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBackground Check Results Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBackground Check Requested from Law Enforcement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Name Change; Order to Show Cause for Change of Name; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Decree of Change Of Name

    Read MoreRead Less