This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 05:03:40 (UTC).

Hignell, Inc vs Taylor, Joe et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Hignell, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Taylor, Joe. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2780

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hignell, Inc

Defendant

Taylor, Joe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacobs, Douglas Bram

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

11/23/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

11/28/2022: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

12/02/2022: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/09/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal; Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Common Counts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Breach of Contract; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $425.0; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $46650.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less