This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/21/2022 at 02:39:49 (UTC).

Hartman, Jason et al vs Federal Emergency Management Agency et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Hartman, Jason filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Federal Emergency Management Agency. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L, Glusman, Robert A and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0483

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Glusman, Robert A

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hartman, Jason

Hartman, Ashley

Defendants

Federal Emergency Management Agency

United States of America

County of Butte

Sampson, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Demas, John Nickolas

Spangler, Timothy Stuart

Defendant Attorneys

Camy, William Ernest

Alpert, Bruce Sheldon

Horan, Stephen Edward

Stephens, Bradley Justin

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

12/01/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Civil Minutes

09/29/2021: Civil Minutes

County of Butte's Case Management Statement

09/14/2021: County of Butte's Case Management Statement

Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement

09/13/2021: Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

04/28/2021: Civil Minutes

Defendant County of Butte's Case Management Statement

04/13/2021: Defendant County of Butte's Case Management Statement

Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement

04/12/2021: Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

01/27/2021: Civil Minutes

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

01/12/2021: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Status re: Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement; County of Butte's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Status Re: Federal Court; Plaintiff; Attorney: Spangler, Timothy Stuart; Plaintiff; Attorney: Spangler, Timothy Stuart

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; County of Butte's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement; Comment: Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement; Defendant County of Butte's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Status of Removal to Federal Court; Plaintiff; Attorney: Spangler, Timothy Stuart; Plaintiff; Attorney: Spangler, Timothy Stuart; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Horan, Stephen Edward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Defendant County of Butte's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Negligence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 02/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Real Property; File Date 02/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 02/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 02/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Unserved; Served: 08/26/2020; Served: 08/19/2020; Served: 08/19/2020; Served: 08/19/2020; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Emergency Management Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where County of Butte is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATE OF AMERICAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephens, Bradley Justin