This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/21/2022 at 10:57:23 (UTC).

Harm, Shona vs McKay, Cassidy

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Harm, Shona filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against McKay, Cassidy. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McLean, Sandra L and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1623

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

Judge Details

Judges

McLean, Sandra L

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Harm, Shona

Respondent

McKay, Cassidy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - DV/TRO; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order; filed 11/24/2021 -Temporary Orders Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Domestic Violence; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Comment: Temporary Orders Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketProposed Temporary Restraining Order; Comment: Not Used

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketReq for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF)

    Read MoreRead Less