This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/08/2022 at 17:07:07 (UTC).

Hall-Goodbar, Deborah vs Lyft, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Hall-Goodbar, Deborah filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lyft, Inc. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2238

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hall-Goodbar, Deborah

Defendants

Lyft, Inc

Xu, Peng

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lavinski, Kirill

Blair, Matthew P

Ramirez, Oscar

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly, Spencer Hegone

Moloney, Meegan

Dizon, Jeck Santiago

Malla, Steffanie Ann

Trimble, Tracy A

Nevis, Christopher James

Moriarty, Dennis F

 

Court Documents

Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions

11/17/2021: Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions

Opposition to Defendant Peng Xu's Motion to Quash or for Protective Order

11/16/2021: Opposition to Defendant Peng Xu's Motion to Quash or for Protective Order

Peng Xu's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Order

11/09/2021: Peng Xu's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Order

Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Quash

10/27/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Quash

Peng Xu's Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash or in Alternative Protective Order

10/27/2021: Peng Xu's Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash or in Alternative Protective Order

Declaration in Support of Motion to Quash

10/27/2021: Declaration in Support of Motion to Quash

Proof of Mailing Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Monetary Santions

10/26/2021: Proof of Mailing Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Monetary Santions

Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions

12/09/2021: Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions

Civil Minutes

12/01/2021: Civil Minutes

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

07/13/2022: Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

Proof of Mailing

04/19/2022: Proof of Mailing

Stipulation and Protective Order- Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations

03/29/2022: Stipulation and Protective Order- Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations

Civil Minutes

02/23/2022: Civil Minutes

Xu's Case Management Statement

02/18/2022: Xu's Case Management Statement

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

02/09/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Defendant's Case Management Statement

02/08/2022: Defendant's Case Management Statement

Proof of Mailing

12/21/2021: Proof of Mailing

Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions

12/09/2021: Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial; Stipulation and Protective Order- Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: 5 Day Estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Stipulation and Protective Order- Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: 5 Day Estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSettlement Conference; Stipulation and Protective Order- Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Change in Handling Attorney; Comment: Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Stipulation and Protective Order- Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations; Comment: Stipulation and Protective Order- Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Defendant's Case Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Xu's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Plaintiff; Retained Counsel: Ramirez, Oscar; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Nevis, Christopher James; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Moriarty, Dennis F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Xu's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketJury Deposit - Non Refundable

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration in Support of Motion to Quash; Comment: Declaration in Support of Motion to Quash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Proof of Mailing Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Monetary Sanctions; Comment: Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order and Monetary Santions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Fee; Motion for Protective Order and Monetary Sanctions Against Peng Xu and Counsel; Comment: Motion for Protective Order and Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Peng Xu and Counsel; Declaration of Matthew Blair

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt; Receipt Transfer of Records Returned to Transferring Court; Comment: Transfer of Records Returned to Transferring Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Minute Order and Order of Transfer; Comment: Minute Order and Order of Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Vehicle Accident

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 02/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Complaint for Personal Injury; Comment: Complaint for Personal Injury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiled in Original Jurisdiction

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trimble, Tracy A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MALLA, STEFFANIE A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIZON JECK SANTIAGO