This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 16:17:41 (UTC).

Guardianship of: Rhodes, Kylie Carter

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Guardianship of Rhodes, Kylie Carter was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keithley, Clare. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0286

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

Judge Details

Judge

Keithley, Clare

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bloomer, Ashley Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketReview Hearing; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare; Hearing Time: 1:35 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketLetters Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAppointment; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Temporary Orders for Guardianship Granted.; Petitioner: Bloomer, Ashley Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketReport and Recommendation of Court Investigator PR1513(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketConsent-Nomination-Waiver (GC-211)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCourt Investigation Fee (PR1513.1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Investigator; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketLetters Issued - Temporary

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketPetition for Appointment - Temporary Conservator or Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketInvestigator's Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDuties of Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketConsent-Nomination-Waiver (GC-211); Comment: Consent of Proposed Guardian, Consent to Appointment of Guardian and Waiver of Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketConsent-Nomination-Waiver (GC-211); Comment: Consent of Proposed Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketConsent-Nomination-Waiver (GC-211); Comment: Consent of Proposed Guardian, Nomination of Guardian, Consent to Appointment of Guardian and Waiver of Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less