This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 06:58:59 (UTC).

Grisak, Merry vs. Inter-Cal Real Estate Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Grisak, Merry filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Inter-Cal Real Estate Corporation. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benson, Stephen E, Mosbarger, Tamara L and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0570

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Judges

Benson, Stephen E

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grisak, Merry

Defendants

Peter P. Bollinger Investment Company, LLC

Raley's, a California Corporation

Inter-Cal Real Estate Corporation

PPB Oroville LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beary, Louis George, Jr.

Defendant Attorney

Kilduff, Douglas MacGregor

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

12/06/2021: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

12/08/2021: Civil Minutes

Defendants' Case Management Statement

11/22/2021: Defendants' Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

09/08/2021: Civil Minutes

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

08/05/2021: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Answer to Complaint

04/08/2021: Answer to Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Peter P Bollinger Investment Company, LLC

03/22/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to Peter P Bollinger Investment Company, LLC

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt as to PPB Oroville LLC

04/06/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt as to PPB Oroville LLC

Proof of Service of Summons as to Raley's

03/22/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to Raley's

Civil Minutes

03/30/2022: Civil Minutes

Defendants' Case Management Statement

03/15/2022: Defendants' Case Management Statement

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

03/09/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

12/08/2021: Civil Minutes

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

12/06/2021: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Defendants' Case Management Statement

11/22/2021: Defendants' Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

09/08/2021: Civil Minutes

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

08/05/2021: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Answer to Complaint

04/08/2021: Answer to Complaint

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: 4 Day Time Estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: 4 Day Time Estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketSettlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Defendants' Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 12/8/21; Plaintiff; Attorney: Beary, Louis George, Jr.; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Kilduff, Douglas MacGregor; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Kilduff, Douglas MacGregor; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Kilduff, Douglas MacGregor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Defendants' Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Defendants' Case Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 9/8/21; Plaintiff; Attorney: Beary, Louis George, Jr.; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Kilduff, Douglas MacGregor; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Kilduff, Douglas MacGregor; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Kilduff, Douglas MacGregor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Comment: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to InterCal Real Estate Corporation; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to InterCal Real Estate Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Peter P Bollinger Investment Company, LLC; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Peter P Bollinger Investment Company, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Raley's; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Raley's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 03/17/2021; Served: 03/14/2021; Served: 03/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Proof of Mailing of Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Comment: Proof of Mailing of Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Inter-Cal Real Estate Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Peter P. Bollinger Investment Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RALEY'S INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEARY JR, LOUIS G.