This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 10:32:32 (UTC).

Geiger, Sarah vs. Brunken, Lon

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Geiger, Sarah filed an Other lawsuit against Brunken, Lon. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gingery, Virginia and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2950

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gingery, Virginia

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Geiger, Sarah

Respondent

Brunken, Lon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Power, Stacie Lynn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Comment: Amended Restraining Order After Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Comment: 2nd Amended Temporary Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketResponse - No Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Two Hour Time Estimate; Petitioner: Geiger, Sarah; Attorney: Power, Stacie Lynn; Respondent: Brunken, Lon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketRequest for Order - Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Temporary Orders Granted; Petitioner: Geiger, Sarah; Attorney: Power, Stacie Lynn; Respondent: Brunken, Lon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Comment: Amended Temporary Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less