This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/04/2021 at 06:01:22 (UTC).

Garcia, Linda vs. Singh, Jobanit et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Garcia, Linda filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Singh, Jobanit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1988

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia, Linda

Defendants

Singh, Jobanit

State of California Department of Transportation

Shaheen Transport, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Puritz, Lawrence Alan

Puritz, Sean E

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

08/10/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Complaint

08/06/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/06/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

08/06/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Communication

08/13/2021: Communication

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCommunication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shaheen Transport, LLC, a California limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF CALIFORNIA-DEPARTMENT OF PARKS is a litigant