This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/04/2022 at 20:28:36 (UTC).

Freeman, Denise R. vs Fisher, Andrew J.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Freeman, Denise R filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fisher, Andrew J. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2737

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freeman, Denise R.

Defendant

Fisher, Andrew J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Griffith, David Richard

Defendant Attorneys

Knowles, Sara M

Sweeney, Kevin Joseph

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Compliance with Demurrer Meet and Confer

11/29/2021: Declaration in Compliance with Demurrer Meet and Confer

Proof of Mailing

11/08/2021: Proof of Mailing

Opposition to Demurrer

12/16/2021: Opposition to Demurrer

Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant

01/04/2022: Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant

First Amended Complaint

12/29/2021: First Amended Complaint

Notice of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

11/29/2021: Notice of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Complaint

11/05/2021: Complaint

Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

11/05/2021: Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

Civil Minutes

12/29/2021: Civil Minutes

Notice of CMC

04/28/2022: Notice of CMC

Civil Minutes

04/27/2022: Civil Minutes

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

04/12/2022: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer

02/02/2022: Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer

Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant

01/04/2022: Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant

First Amended Complaint

12/29/2021: First Amended Complaint

Civil Minutes

12/29/2021: Civil Minutes

Opposition to Demurrer

12/16/2021: Opposition to Demurrer

Substitution of Attorney

12/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of CMC; Comment: Notice of CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Summons Issued and Filed; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Plaintiff; Retained Counsel: Griffith, David Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer; Comment: Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet and Confer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant; Comment: Substitution of Attorney as to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Intentional Tort; Type: Action; Description: Constructive Fraud Civ Code 1573

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Intentional Tort; Type: Action; Description: Imposition of Constructive Trust; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Intentional Tort; File Date 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Notice of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: Notice of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWEENEY KEVIN JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Knowles, Sara M