This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 04:04:51 (UTC).

Frazier, Anjoli et al vs Thall, Michael Steven

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 Frazier, Anjoli filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Thall, Michael Steven. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0897

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frazier, Anjoli

Turner, Kristin

Defendant

Thall, Michael Steven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cardoza, Anthony R

 

Court Documents

Summons

04/29/2022: Summons

Complaint

04/29/2022: Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

04/29/2022: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Mailing

04/29/2022: Proof of Mailing

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Michael Steven Thall

05/31/2022: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Michael Steven Thall

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Summons; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Michael Steven Thall; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Michael Steven Thall; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Michael Steven Thall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Negligence; Type: Action; Description: Motor Vehicle; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 04/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 05/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cardoza, Anthony R