Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 23:00:36 (UTC).

Faulkner, Delaney vs. Canyon Oaks Country Club et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Faulkner, Delaney filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Canyon Oaks Country Club. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1451

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Butte County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faulkner, Delaney

Defendants

American Golf Corporation

Canyon Oaks Country Club

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baumbach, Larry L

Defendant Attorneys

Fears, Daniel F

Lewis, Matthew C

Narvid, Leila

Moss, James Rex, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

01/05/2021: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

09/30/2020: Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

All - Proof of Mailing

07/23/2020: All - Proof of Mailing

All - Proof of Mailing

07/23/2020: All - Proof of Mailing

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

07/23/2020: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Complaint for Damages

07/23/2020: Complaint for Damages

Summons

07/23/2020: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver

07/23/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver

All - Proof of Mailing

09/30/2020: All - Proof of Mailing

Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

09/23/2020: Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

Declaration of Delaney Faulkner in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

09/17/2020: Declaration of Delaney Faulkner in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration

Opposition to Defendants' motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

09/17/2020: Opposition to Defendants' motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

Declaration of Huguely in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

08/31/2020: Declaration of Huguely in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

Declaration of Narvid in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

08/31/2020: Declaration of Narvid in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

Defendants' Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

08/31/2020: Defendants' Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration

Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

08/31/2020: Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

Proof of Service of Summons as to American Gold Corporation

08/13/2020: Proof of Service of Summons as to American Gold Corporation

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: Status of Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Order on Court Fee Waiver; Summons; Complaint for Damages; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; All - Proof of Mailing; All - Proof of Mailing; Proof of Service of Summons as to American Gold Corporation; Defendants' Case Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re Status of Arbitration; Plaintiff; Attorney: Baumbach, Larry L; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Narvid, Leila; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Narvid, Leila

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Defendants' Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling; Notice of Entry of Order Re Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order Re Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; All - Proof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: Defendants' motion to compel arbitration is granted. The Court will sign the proposed Order. The Court confirms the case management conference set for January 20, 2021, at 10:30 a.m., for status of arbitration.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Comment: Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Intentional Tort; File Date 07/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Served: 07/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; All - Proof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; All - Proof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Complaint for Damages; Comment: Complaint for Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted; Order on Court Fee Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN GOLF CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry L. Baumbach