This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 05:01:37 (UTC).

Farmers Insurance Exchange vs Broan-Nutone LLC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Farmers Insurance Exchange filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-Nutone LLC. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2438

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farmers Insurance Exchange

Defendant

Broan-Nutone LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Audley, Michael Richard

Defendant Attorneys

Mijanovic, Krsto

Thai, Sinny B

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/29/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

09/29/2021: Summons

Proof of Mailing

09/29/2021: Proof of Mailing

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

09/29/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons as to Broan-Nutone LLC

10/26/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to Broan-Nutone LLC

Answer

11/01/2021: Answer

Notice of Removal to Superior Court

11/03/2021: Notice of Removal to Superior Court

Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Removal Papers

11/03/2021: Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Removal Papers

Notice of Hearing

11/05/2021: Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference; Notice of Removal to Superior Court; Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Removal Papers; Notice of Hearing; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: Status of Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Summons; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Proof of Service of Summons as to Broan-Nutone LLC; Answer; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Removal Papers; Comment: Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Removal Papers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemoval to Federal Court; Notice of Removal to Superior Court; Comment: Notice of Removal to Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Broan-Nutone LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: Breach of Implied Warranty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Cause Of ActionNegligence; Type: Action; Description: Products Liability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Cause Of ActionIntentional Tort; Type: Action; Description: Trespass

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Intentional Tort; File Date 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THAI SINNY B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIJANOVIC KRSTO