This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 12/26/2022 at 22:00:07 (UTC).

Estate of Terry, Kathleen Anne

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Estate of Terry, Kathleen Anne was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0301

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lopez, Michael Ray, Jr.

Claimant

Butte County Credit Bureau a Corp

Decedent

Terry, Kathleen Anne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Vance, Desiree J

Claimant Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing

07/11/2022: Proof of Mailing

Receipt on Distribution

05/10/2022: Receipt on Distribution

Receipt on Distribution as to Kassandra Lopez

04/20/2022: Receipt on Distribution as to Kassandra Lopez

Receipt on Distribution as to Michael Lopez

04/20/2022: Receipt on Distribution as to Michael Lopez

Proof of Mailing

02/18/2022: Proof of Mailing

Creditors Claim as to Butte County Credit Bureau

12/06/2021: Creditors Claim as to Butte County Credit Bureau

Notice of Proposed Action as to Alex Brock

11/09/2021: Notice of Proposed Action as to Alex Brock

Notice of Proposed Action as to Paul Branch

11/09/2021: Notice of Proposed Action as to Paul Branch

Notice of Proposed Action as to Kassandra R Lopez

11/09/2021: Notice of Proposed Action as to Kassandra R Lopez

Final Inventory and Appraisal

10/12/2021: Final Inventory and Appraisal

Order Appointing Administrator

08/24/2021: Order Appointing Administrator

Probate Minutes

08/24/2021: Probate Minutes

Letters Issued

08/24/2021: Letters Issued

Proof of Publication

07/26/2021: Proof of Publication

Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

07/06/2021: Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

07/06/2021: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Petition to Administer Estate

07/06/2021: Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Hearing

07/06/2021: Notice of Hearing

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview Hearing; Receipt on Distribution as to Michael Lopez; Receipt on Distribution as to Kassandra Lopez; Receipt on Distribution; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Final Discharge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview Hearing; Final Inventory and Appraisal; Notice of Proposed Action as to Kassandra R Lopez; Notice of Proposed Action as to Paul Branch; Notice of Proposed Action as to Alex Brock; Creditors Claim as to Butte County Credit Bureau; Proof of Mailing; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Ex Parte Petition and Order for Final Discharge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Desiree J Vance Re: Receipt on Distribution for Paul Branch; Comment: Declaration of Desiree J Vance Re: Receipt on Distribution for Paul Branch

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt; Receipt on Distribution as to Kassandra Lopez; Comment: Receipt on Distribution as to Kassandra Lopez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt; Receipt on Distribution as to Michael Lopez; Comment: Receipt on Distribution as to Michael Lopez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: The petition is granted, letters shall issue with full authority, bond is set at $210,000, Jane Dolan is appointed probate referee and the matter is set for final distribution hearing on August 16, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Administrator; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Notice of Hearing; Petition to Administer Estate; Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative; Letters Issued; Proof of Publication; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof or Affidavit of Publication; Proof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement Duties & Liabilities of Personal Rep

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less