This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 17:51:19 (UTC).

Estate of Sullivan, Donna Jean

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Estate of Sullivan, Donna Jean was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Trulin, Tamara M and Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0264

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Trulin, Tamara M

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Haber, Nicholle D

Shoemaker, Kristine

Sullivan, Cory

Claimants

Desiree Vance and Associates

Butte Credit

Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. on Behalf of Merrick Bank Corporation

JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

Decedent

Sullivan, Donna Jean

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Decedent Attorneys

Vance, Desiree J

Alexander, Daniel Holden

Claimant Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Notice of Proposed Action

04/12/2023: Notice of Proposed Action

Notice of Proposed Action

04/12/2023: Notice of Proposed Action

Creditor's Claim as to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

02/21/2023: Creditor's Claim as to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

Amended Inventory and Appraisal; Final

01/12/2023: Amended Inventory and Appraisal; Final

Amendment to Notice to Creditors

01/04/2023: Amendment to Notice to Creditors

Creditor's Claim as to Butte Credit

12/13/2022: Creditor's Claim as to Butte Credit

Notice to Creditors

11/14/2022: Notice to Creditors

Notice of Proposed Action

11/07/2022: Notice of Proposed Action

Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

10/10/2022: Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

Bond Posted

09/29/2022: Bond Posted

Probate Minutes

06/14/2022: Probate Minutes

Response to Objection to the Petition of Nicholle Haber

06/13/2022: Response to Objection to the Petition of Nicholle Haber

Objection to the Petition of Nicholle D Haber

06/10/2022: Objection to the Petition of Nicholle D Haber

Proof of Publication

06/03/2022: Proof of Publication

Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

05/06/2022: Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

05/06/2022: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Hearing

05/06/2022: Notice of Hearing

Petition to Administer Estate

05/06/2022: Petition to Administer Estate

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview Hearing; Bond Posted; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative; Notice of Proposed Action; Notice to Creditors; Creditor's Claim as to Butte Credit; Amendment to Notice to Creditors; Amended Inventory and Appraisal; Final; Creditor's Claim as to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA; Notice of Proposed Action; Notice of Proposed Action; Rejection of Creditors Claim - JPMorgan Chase Bank NA; Rejection of Creditors Claim - UC Davis; Judicial Officer: Trulin, Tamara M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAllowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim; Rejection of Creditors Claim - UC Davis; Comment: Rejection of Creditors Claim - UC Davis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAllowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim; Rejection of Creditors Claim - JPMorgan Chase Bank NA; Comment: Rejection of Creditors Claim - JPMorgan Chase Bank NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Proposed Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Proposed Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditor's Claim as to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA; Comment: Creditor's Claim as to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal; Amended Inventory and Appraisal; Final; Comment: Amended Inventory and Appraisal; Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Amendment to Notice to Creditors; Comment: Amendment to Notice to Creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditor s Claim as to Merrick Bank Corporation; Comment: Creditors Claim filed by Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd on behalf of Merrick Bank Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditor's Claim as to Butte Credit; Comment: Creditor's Claim as to Butte Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: The Court will hear from counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Petition to Administer Estate; Notice of Hearing; Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative; Proof of Publication; Objection to the Petition of Nicholle D Haber; Response to Objection to the Petition of Nicholle Haber; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition to Administer Estate; Petitioner; Attorney: Vance, Desiree J; Decedent; Attorney: Vance, Desiree J; Petitioner; Attorney: Alexander, Daniel Holden; Petitioner; Attorney: Alexander, Daniel Holden

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse - No Fee; Response to Objection to the Petition of Nicholle Haber; Comment: Response to Objection to the Petition of Nicholle Haber

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Petition to Administer Estate; Objection to the Petition of Nicholle D Haber; Comment: Objection to the Petition of Nicholle D Haber

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof or Affidavit of Publication; Proof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less