This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 22:00:35 (UTC).

Estate of Sullivan, Donna Jean

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Estate of Sullivan, Donna Jean was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Trulin, Tamara M and Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0264

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Trulin, Tamara M

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Haber, Nicholle D

Shoemaker, Kristine

Sullivan, Cory

Claimants

Desiree Vance and Associates

Butte Credit

Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. on Behalf of Merrick Bank Corporation

Decedent

Sullivan, Donna Jean

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Decedent Attorneys

Vance, Desiree J

Alexander, Daniel Holden

Claimant Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Statements in Support of Shoemaker and Sullivan's Petition for Letters

07/25/2022: Statements in Support of Shoemaker and Sullivan's Petition for Letters

Response to Objection to the Petition of Nicholle Haber

06/13/2022: Response to Objection to the Petition of Nicholle Haber

Creditor's Claim as to Butte Credit

12/13/2022: Creditor's Claim as to Butte Credit

Amendment to Notice to Creditors

12/12/2022: Amendment to Notice to Creditors

Creditor's Claim as to UC Davis Health

11/29/2022: Creditor's Claim as to UC Davis Health

Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

10/10/2022: Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

Substitution of Attorney

10/10/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Decedent's Death

10/05/2022: Notice of Decedent's Death

Bond Posted

09/29/2022: Bond Posted

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview Hearing; Bond Posted; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative; Notice of Proposed Action; Notice to Creditors; Creditor's Claim as to Butte Credit; Judicial Officer: Trulin, Tamara M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditor s Claim as to Merrick Bank Corporation; Comment: Creditors Claim filed by Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd on behalf of Merrick Bank Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditor's Claim as to Butte Credit; Comment: Creditor's Claim as to Butte Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Amendment to Notice to Creditors; Comment: Amendment to Notice to Creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditor's Claim as to UC Davis Health; Comment: Creditors Claim as to UC Davis Health

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditors Claim as to Capitol one, N.A. Quicksilver; Comment: Creditors Claim as to Capitol one, N.A. Quicksilver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice to Creditors; Comment: Notice to Creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Proposed Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: The Court will hear from counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Petition to Administer Estate; Notice of Hearing; Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative; Proof of Publication; Objection to the Petition of Nicholle D Haber; Response to Objection to the Petition of Nicholle Haber; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition to Administer Estate; Petitioner; Attorney: Vance, Desiree J; Decedent; Attorney: Vance, Desiree J; Petitioner; Attorney: Alexander, Daniel Holden; Petitioner; Attorney: Alexander, Daniel Holden

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse - No Fee; Response to Objection to the Petition of Nicholle Haber; Comment: Response to Objection to the Petition of Nicholle Haber

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Petition to Administer Estate; Objection to the Petition of Nicholle D Haber; Comment: Objection to the Petition of Nicholle D Haber

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof or Affidavit of Publication; Proof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less