This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 14:15:48 (UTC).

Estate of Holt, William Clark

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Estate of Holt, William Clark was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0109

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Carrion, Olivia C

Claimants

Teutsch DDS, Jeffery E

Butte Credit

Decedent

Holt, William Clark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Vance, Desiree J

Claimant Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

03/01/2022: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Notice of Hearing

03/01/2022: Notice of Hearing

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

03/01/2022: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority

03/01/2022: Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority

Proof of Publication

03/24/2022: Proof of Publication

Letters Issued

03/29/2022: Letters Issued

Probate Minutes

03/29/2022: Probate Minutes

Order Appointing Administrator

03/29/2022: Order Appointing Administrator

Proof of Mailing

03/29/2022: Proof of Mailing

Final Inventory and Appraisal

05/09/2022: Final Inventory and Appraisal

Notice of Returned Documents

09/30/2022: Notice of Returned Documents

Creditor's Claim

10/14/2022: Creditor's Claim

Notice of Returned Documents

10/21/2022: Notice of Returned Documents

Creditors Claim of Butte Credit

10/25/2022: Creditors Claim of Butte Credit

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview Hearing; Final Inventory and Appraisal; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditors Claim of Butte Credit; Comment: Creditors Claim of Butte Credit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Returned Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Returned Documents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal; Final Inventory and Appraisal; Comment: Final Inventory and Appraisal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: The petition is granted, letters shall issue with full authority, bond is waived, Jane Dolan is appointed probate referee, and a final distribution hearing is set for March 28, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Administrator; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Letters Issued; Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative; Notice of Hearing; Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority; Proof of Publication; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof or Affidavit of Publication; Proof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Administer Estate; Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority; Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketConfidential Supplement Duties & Liabilities of Personal Rep

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less