This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 04:00:28 (UTC).

Estate of Cullum, William Frank

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Estate of Cullum, William Frank was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Trulin, Tamara M and Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0053

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

Judge Details

Judges

Trulin, Tamara M

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cullum, Donald Wayne

Claimants

Bank of America, NA

Wells Fargo Bank, N A

Capital One Bank (USA) NA

Decedent

Cullum, William Frank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Decedent Attorney

Vance, Desiree J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

02/02/2022: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority

02/02/2022: Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority

Notice of Hearing

02/02/2022: Notice of Hearing

Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

02/02/2022: Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim As to Capital One, NA Capital One Walmart Awards

06/28/2022: Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim As to Capital One, NA Capital One Walmart Awards

Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim -Wells Fargo

06/16/2022: Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim -Wells Fargo

Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim -Bay of America

06/16/2022: Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim -Bay of America

Creditor's Claim Capital One NA, Capital One Walmart rewards Card $4,587.78

04/27/2022: Creditor's Claim Capital One NA, Capital One Walmart rewards Card $4,587.78

Creditor's Claim from Wells Fargo Bank, NA

04/25/2022: Creditor's Claim from Wells Fargo Bank, NA

Creditor's Claim from Bank of America, NA

04/25/2022: Creditor's Claim from Bank of America, NA

Inventory and Appraisal- Final

04/18/2022: Inventory and Appraisal- Final

Proof of Mailing

03/15/2022: Proof of Mailing

Order Appointing Administrator

03/15/2022: Order Appointing Administrator

Probate Minutes

03/15/2022: Probate Minutes

Letters Issued

03/15/2022: Letters Issued

Affidavit Proof of Publication

02/28/2022: Affidavit Proof of Publication

Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

02/02/2022: Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

02/02/2022: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview Hearing; Inventory and Appraisal- Final; Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim -Bay of America; Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim -Wells Fargo; Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim As to Capital One, NA Capital One Walmart Awards; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim; Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim As to Capital One, NA Capital One Walmart Awards; Comment: As to Capital One, NA Capital One Walmart Awards

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim; Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim -Wells Fargo; Comment: Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim -Wells Fargo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim; Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim -Bay of America; Comment: Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim -Bay of America

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditor's Claim Capital One NA, Capital One Walmart rewards Card $4,587.78; Comment: Creditor's Claim Capital One NA, Capital One Walmart rewards Card $4,587.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditor's Claim from Wells Fargo Bank, NA; Comment: Creditor s Claim from Wells Fargo Bank, NA for $2447.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditor's Claim from Bank of America, NA; Comment: Creditor s Claim from Bank of America, NA for $5645.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal; Inventory and Appraisal- Final; Comment: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: The petition is granted and letters with full authority shall issue, bond is waived, Jane Dolan is appointed probate referee and a final distribution hearing is set for March 14, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Administrator; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority; Notice of Hearing; Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative; Letters Issued; Affidavit Proof of Publication; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority; Petitioner; Attorney: Vance, Desiree J; Decedent; Attorney: Vance, Desiree J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit; Affidavit Proof of Publication; Comment: Affidavit Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketConditional Supplemental Information; Comment: Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Administer Estate; Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority; Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vance, Desiree J