This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/05/2023 at 07:21:50 (UTC).

Estate of Clark, Kristina Lynn

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Estate of Clark, Kristina Lynn was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0401

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Stratton, David A

Claimant

Discover Bank

Decedent

Clark, Kristina Lynn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LeClerc, Raoul J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

07/21/2022: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Petition to Administer Estate

07/21/2022: Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Holographic Instrument

07/21/2022: Proof of Holographic Instrument

Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

07/21/2022: Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

Proof of Publication

08/12/2022: Proof of Publication

Letters Issued

08/16/2022: Letters Issued

Probate Minutes

08/16/2022: Probate Minutes

Order Appointing Administrator

08/16/2022: Order Appointing Administrator

Will - Filed

08/16/2022: Will - Filed

Proof of Mailing

08/16/2022: Proof of Mailing

Notice to Franchise Tax Board

08/18/2022: Notice to Franchise Tax Board

Final Inventory and Appraisal

09/29/2022: Final Inventory and Appraisal

Creditor's Claim by Discover Bank

10/04/2022: Creditor's Claim by Discover Bank

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview Hearing; Final Inventory and Appraisal; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Creditor's Claim by Discover Bank; Comment: Creditor's Claim by Discover Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal; Final Inventory and Appraisal; Comment: Final Inventory and Appraisal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice to Franchise Tax Board; Comment: Notice to Franchise Tax Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWill - Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: The petition is granted, letters testamentary with full authority shall issue, bond is waived. Jane Dolan is appointed as probate referee and a final distribution hearing is set for August 15, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Administrator; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Petition to Administer Estate; Proof of Holographic Instrument; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative; Letters Issued; Proof of Publication; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof or Affidavit of Publication; Proof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketWill - Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketStatement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Holographic Instrument

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LeClerc, Raoul J