This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 06:00:18 (UTC).

Estate of Barker, David Franz

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Estate of Barker, David Franz was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0319

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rainwater, Aaron J

Claimant

Butte County Credit Bureau

Decedent

Barker, David Franz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Vance, Desiree J

Claimant Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing

05/26/2022: Proof of Mailing

Receipt on Distribution as to Aaron Rainwater

05/03/2022: Receipt on Distribution as to Aaron Rainwater

Proof of Mailing

03/01/2022: Proof of Mailing

Order Settling First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account and for Allowance

03/01/2022: Order Settling First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account and for Allowance

Notice of Hearing

01/26/2022: Notice of Hearing

Creditors Claim by Butte County Credit Bureau

09/10/2021: Creditors Claim by Butte County Credit Bureau

Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order

05/10/2022: Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Proof of Mailing

08/18/2021: Proof of Mailing

Receipt on Distribution as to Frank Rainwater

05/03/2022: Receipt on Distribution as to Frank Rainwater

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview Hearing; Receipt on Distribution as to Frank Rainwater; Receipt on Distribution as to Aaron Rainwater; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Final Discharge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview Hearing; Rejection of Creditor's Claim for Butte County Credit Bureau; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Comment: Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution; Receipt on Distribution as to Aaron Rainwater; Comment: Receipt on Distribution as to Aaron Rainwater

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt on Distribution; Receipt on Distribution as to Frank Rainwater; Comment: Receipt on Distribution as to Frank Rainwater

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: The First and Final Report of Status of Administration and Account by Administrator is settled and approved. The review hearing on August 16, 2022 is vacated and the matter is set for a hearing on final discharge on August 30, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Order Settling First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account and for Allowance; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Comment: Order Settling First and Final Report of Administrator, Waiver of Account and for Allowance of Statutory Compensation to Attorney, and for Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Petition to Administer Estate; Notice of Hearing; Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Letters Issued; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative; Final Inventory and Appraisal; Proof of Publication; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof or Affidavit of Publication; Proof of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal; Final Inventory and Appraisal; Comment: Final Inventory and Appraisal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement Duties & Liabilities of Personal Rep

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Administer Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted; Order on Fee Waiver-Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less