This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 16:01:33 (UTC).

Estate of Anderson, Donald Philip

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Estate of Anderson, Donald Philip was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0256

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Croft, Lisa Michele

Decedent

Anderson, Donald Philip

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Decedent Attorney

Vance, Desiree J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

05/02/2022: Notice of Hearing

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

05/02/2022: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Petition to Administer Estate

05/02/2022: Petition to Administer Estate

Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

05/02/2022: Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

Amended Notice of Hearing

05/09/2022: Amended Notice of Hearing

Proof of Publication

05/18/2022: Proof of Publication

Letters Issued

05/31/2022: Letters Issued

Probate Minutes

05/31/2022: Probate Minutes

Order Appointing Administrator

05/31/2022: Order Appointing Administrator

Proof of Mailing

05/31/2022: Proof of Mailing

Notice of Hearing

06/16/2022: Notice of Hearing

Petition to Confirm Assets to Decedent's Estate

06/16/2022: Petition to Confirm Assets to Decedent's Estate

Inventory and Appraisal

06/23/2022: Inventory and Appraisal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketReview Hearing; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Notice of Hearing; Petition to Confirm Assets to Decedent's Estate; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Petition to Confirm Assets to Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition-Other Subsequent; Petition to Confirm Assets to Decedent's Estate; Comment: Petition to Confirm Assets to Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: The petition is granted, bond is waived, letters shall issue with full authority, Jane Dolan is appointed probate referee and a final distribution hearing is set for May 30, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Administrator; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Notice of Hearing; Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Petition to Administer Estate; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative; Letters Issued; Amended Notice of Hearing; Proof of Publication; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof or Affidavit of Publication; Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Amended Notice of Hearing; Comment: Amended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Comment: Confidential Statement of Birth Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative; Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vance, Desiree J