This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/05/2022 at 11:11:30 (UTC).

Enloe Medical Center, a California non-profit public benefit corporation vs HealthScope Benefits, Inc a Delaware for-profit corporation

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Enloe Medical Center, a California non-profit public benefit corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HealthScope Benefits, Inc a Delaware for-profit corporation. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1487

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Enloe Medical Center, a California non-profit public benefit corporation

Defendant

HealthScope Benefits, Inc a Delaware for-profit corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rogers-Aberman, Karlene Jasmine

Lam, Barbara V

Stephenson-Laws, Melanie Joy

Mastan, David Frank

Lovich, Richard Alan

Defendant Attorney

Westerfeld, Bryan Scott

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change in Lead Attorney

03/21/2022: Notice of Change in Lead Attorney

Proof of Mailing

12/20/2021: Proof of Mailing

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

12/01/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Findings of the Court and Order Striking

11/29/2021: Findings of the Court and Order Striking

Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court

07/27/2021: Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court

Defendants Answer to Complaint

07/19/2021: Defendants Answer to Complaint

Summons

06/09/2021: Summons

Civil Minutes

02/02/2022: Civil Minutes

Proof of Mailing

12/01/2021: Proof of Mailing

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Change in Lead Attorney; Comment: Notice of Change in Lead Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Status of Removal to Federal Court; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Westerfeld, Bryan Scott

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Summons; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Defendants Answer to Complaint; Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Findings of the Court and Order Striking; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Comment: Findings of the Court and Order Striking

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement; Joint Statement Regarding Erisa Action *Order Striking 11/29/2021*; Comment: *Order Striking 11/29/2021* Joint Statement Regarding Erisa Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court; Comment: Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Defendants Answer to Complaint; Comment: Defendants Answer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Quantum Meruit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Breach of Implied-In-Fact Contract; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 06/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 06/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less