This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/05/2022 at 06:04:47 (UTC).

Earley, Joseph et al vs Mayer, Marsha et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 Earley, Joseph filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mayer, Marsha. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0584

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Earley, Joseph

Joseph M Earley, III, APC

Estep, Ashley

Defendants

Mayer, Marsha

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

American Automobile Insurance Company

Interwest Insurance Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karnikian, Shant Arthur

Kabateck, Brian Stephen

Defendant Attorneys

Ashton, Kathryn Courtney

Miller, William Andrew

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

03/23/2022: Summons

Complaint

03/23/2022: Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

03/24/2022: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

04/07/2022: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

04/07/2022: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to American Automobile Insurance Company

04/07/2022: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to American Automobile Insurance Company

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Marsha Mayer

04/18/2022: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Marsha Mayer

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Defendant Interwest Insurance Services

05/02/2022: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Defendant Interwest Insurance Services

Answer of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company dba Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty

05/18/2022: Answer of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company dba Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty

Defendant Interwest Insurance Company Services, Inc dba Interwest Insurance Service LLC, Marsha

06/01/2022: Defendant Interwest Insurance Company Services, Inc dba Interwest Insurance Service LLC, Marsha

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Summons; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Fireman's Fund Insurance Company; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to American Automobile Insurance Company; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Marsha Mayer; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Defendant Interwest Insurance Services; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Defendant Interwest Insurance Company Services, Inc dba Interwest Insurance Service LLC, Marsha; Comment: Defendant Interwest Insurance Company Services, Inc dba Interwest Insurance Service LLC and Marsha Mayer's Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Answer of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company dba Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty; Comment: Answer of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company dba Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company dba Fireman's Fund, and American Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Defendant Interwest Insurance Services; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Defendant Interwest Insurance Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Marsha Mayer; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Marsha Mayer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to American Automobile Insurance Company; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to American Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Fireman's Fund Insurance Company; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 04/11/2022; Served: 04/04/2022; Served: 04/04/2022; Served: 04/04/2022; Served: 05/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketJury Deposit - Non Refundable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Interwest Insurance Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where American Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant