This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 10:03:11 (UTC).

Durham Pump, Inc vs Samra, Steve et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Durham Pump, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Samra, Steve. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0070

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Durham Pump, Inc

Defendants

Steve Singh Samra as Trustee of the Steve Singh Samra Revocable Trust

Samra, Steve

Research & Development Farming, LLC

Mesa Asset Management, LLC as Trustee of the 06-010 Gridley Business Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wieder, Andrea

Jacobs, Douglas Bram

Defendant Attorneys

Gentry, Galen M

Hughey, Kevin Alan

Knight, Noel

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing

12/28/2022: Proof of Mailing

Application and Order for Examination as to Steve Samra

12/23/2022: Application and Order for Examination as to Steve Samra

Plaintiff's Objection and Motion to Strike

01/13/2022: Plaintiff's Objection and Motion to Strike

Proof of Mailing

09/08/2022: Proof of Mailing

Application and Order for Examination as to Steve Samra

08/29/2022: Application and Order for Examination as to Steve Samra

Civil Minutes

07/20/2022: Civil Minutes

Request to Vacate Hearing

07/18/2022: Request to Vacate Hearing

Proof of Mailing

07/11/2022: Proof of Mailing

Second Amended Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

07/07/2022: Second Amended Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder of Examination; Application and Order for Examination as to Steve Samra; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Order for Examination as to Defendant Steve Samra

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketApplication and Order for Exam-Judgment Debtor; Application and Order for Examination as to Steve Samra; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Comment: Application and Order for Examination as to Steve Samra

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOrder of Examination; Application and Order for Examination as to Steve Samra; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Examination of Defendant Steve Samra

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOrder; Request to Vacate Hearing and Order; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Comment: Request to Vacate Hearing and Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketApplication and Order for Exam-Judgment Debtor; Application and Order for Examination as to Steve Samra; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: At the request of the moving party, this matter is off calendar.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
61 More Docket Entries
01/09/2020

DocketCause Of Action; Action Judicial Review; File Date 01/09/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020

DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 01/09/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020

DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 01/09/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020

DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 01/09/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020

DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 01/09/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020

DocketProof of Service; Served: 01/26/2020; Served: 01/26/2020; Served: 01/26/2020; Served: 01/22/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less