This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/30/2022 at 10:54:40 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Wright, Janet

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Wright, Janet. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L, Benson, Stephen E and Glusman, Robert A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1780

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

Glusman, Robert A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Wright, Janet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sebourn, Thomas J

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

05/21/2020: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Proof of Mailing Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

05/11/2020: Proof of Mailing Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

Court Issued - Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service

05/11/2020: Court Issued - Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service

Declaration of Non-Service

08/16/2019: Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service

07/15/2019: Declaration of Non-Service

Statement of Venue

06/13/2019: Statement of Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

06/13/2019: Summons

Complaint

06/13/2019: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Complaint; Court Issued - Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service Janet Wright

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Proof of Mailing Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service; Comment: Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Court Issued; Court Issued - Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service; Judicial Officer: Glusman, Robert A; Comment: Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement; Statement of Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sebourn, Thomas J.