This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 05:06:39 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Huynh, Nhu Uyen T

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Huynh, Nhu Uyen T. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1575

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Huynh, Nhu Uyen T

Oroville, CA 95966-5182

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hoffmann, Martin

Brown, Janet Lorraine

Garcia, Jessica M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

08/05/2021: Proof of Service

Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000

08/05/2021: Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000

Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

08/05/2021: Order on Fee Waiver - Granted

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Nhu Uyen T Huynh

07/12/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Nhu Uyen T Huynh

Summons

06/21/2021: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

06/21/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Nhu Uyen T Huynh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: Common Counts; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $3073.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 06/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOFFMAN, MARTIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, JANET L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA, JESSICA M.