This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/09/2022 at 04:05:42 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Howard, Chrisanna

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Howard, Chrisanna. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benson, Stephen E and Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2550

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benson, Stephen E

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Howard, Chrisanna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jensen, Casey M

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

01/02/2019: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Declaration Re: Underlying Action of Account Stated

12/29/2017: Declaration Re: Underlying Action of Account Stated

Summons Issued / Filed

08/25/2017: Summons Issued / Filed

Declaration Re: Waiver of Attorney Fees

12/29/2017: Declaration Re: Waiver of Attorney Fees

Proof of Service of Summons Filed for the Defendant

10/10/2017: Proof of Service of Summons Filed for the Defendant

Default Judgment By Clerk

12/29/2017: Default Judgment By Clerk

Declaration Re: Amount Prayed for in Complaint for Common Counts

12/29/2017: Declaration Re: Amount Prayed for in Complaint for Common Counts

Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs After Judgment

06/08/2018: Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs After Judgment

Request to Enter Default-Entered

12/29/2017: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

01/02/2019: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs After Judgment

06/08/2018: Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs After Judgment

Plaintiff's Writ - Other

06/08/2018: Plaintiff's Writ - Other

Default Judgment By Clerk

12/29/2017: Default Judgment By Clerk

Request to Enter Default-Entered

12/29/2017: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Declaration Re: Underlying Action of Account Stated

12/29/2017: Declaration Re: Underlying Action of Account Stated

Declaration Re: Amount Prayed for in Complaint for Common Counts

12/29/2017: Declaration Re: Amount Prayed for in Complaint for Common Counts

Declaration Re: Waiver of Attorney Fees

12/29/2017: Declaration Re: Waiver of Attorney Fees

Declaration in Support of Judgment (CCP 1033)

12/29/2017: Declaration in Support of Judgment (CCP 1033)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs; Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs After Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit - Other; Plaintiff's Writ - Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; Discover Bank; Howard, Chrisanna; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Discover Bank; Awarded Against; Howard, Chrisanna; Amount; Damages: $5,059.63; Costs: $305.00; Total: $5364.63

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re: Underlying Action of Account Stated; Comment: Re: Underlying Action of Account Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re: Amount Prayed for in Complaint for Common Counts; Comment: Re: Amount Prayed for in Complaint for Common Counts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re: Waiver of Attorney Fees; Comment: Re: Waiver of Attorney Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration in Support of Judgment (CCP 1033); Comment: in Support of Judgment (CCP 1033)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed for the Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Second Cause of Action-Money Lent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: First Cause of Action-Account Stated; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $5059.63

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 08/25/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 08/25/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 09/23/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons Issued / Filed; Comment: 30 day summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: re: Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jensen, Casey M