This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/05/2021 at 05:01:24 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Frazier, Kevin J

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Frazier, Kevin J. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1695

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Frazier, Kevin J

Chico, CA 95973-0540

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patterson, Erin E

Tang, Jason W

Layman, Patrick James

Babilis, Nicholas John

Jordan, Carina M

Wate, Shane Thomas

Sebourn, Thomas J

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

09/02/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

07/29/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Statement of Venue Pursuant to CCP 395b

07/07/2021: Statement of Venue Pursuant to CCP 395b

Summons

07/07/2021: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/07/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

07/07/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: Account Stated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: Open Book Account; Remedy: Damages; Amount: $14484.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement; Statement of Venue Pursuant to CCP 395b; Comment: Statement of Venue Pursuant to CCP 395b

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wate, Shane Thomas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Layman, Patrick James

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patterson, Erin E