This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/07/2023 at 18:42:46 (UTC).

Davis, Justin vs. The Progressive Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 Davis, Justin filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against The Progressive Corporation. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2468

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Davis, Justin

Defendant

The Progressive Corporation

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order

10/24/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order

Service by Clerk for Certified Mail - Each Party

11/21/2022: Service by Clerk for Certified Mail - Each Party

Req for Postponement of Hearing-After Service (SC)

12/05/2022: Req for Postponement of Hearing-After Service (SC)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial

12/05/2022: Order on Request to Postpone Trial

Proof of Mailing

12/21/2022: Proof of Mailing

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial; Plaintiff's Claim and Order; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Plaintiff's Claim $10,000 + $85 Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing; Order on Request to Postpone Trial; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReq for Postponement of Hearing-After Service (SC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketService by Clerk for Certified Mail - Each Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Plaintiff's Claim; Type: Action; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $10000.0; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Plaintiff's Claim; File Date 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE is a litigant