This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 16:02:22 (UTC).

Dale Giese Special Needs Trust, Dated May 30, 2017

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 Dale Giese Special Needs Trust, Dated May 30, 2017 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0449

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Giese, Dale

Respondents

Harvey, Cynthia

Brunson, Ronda

LeClerc-Klein, Danielle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Griffith, David Richard

Respondent Attorney

LeClerc, Raoul J

 

Court Documents

Petition to Compel Accounting

08/17/2022: Petition to Compel Accounting

Citation Issued as to Cynthia Harvey

08/17/2022: Citation Issued as to Cynthia Harvey

Citation Issued as to Danielle LeClerc-Klein

08/17/2022: Citation Issued as to Danielle LeClerc-Klein

Citation Issued as to Rhonda Brunson

08/17/2022: Citation Issued as to Rhonda Brunson

Notice of Hearing

08/18/2022: Notice of Hearing

Citation Returned

08/24/2022: Citation Returned

Probate Minutes

09/27/2022: Probate Minutes

First and Current Account and Report of Trustee and Petition for its Settlement

10/28/2022: First and Current Account and Report of Trustee and Petition for its Settlement

Notice of Hearing

10/28/2022: Notice of Hearing

Notice of Related Case

10/28/2022: Notice of Related Case

Report on Status of Administration

01/24/2023: Report on Status of Administration

Probate Minutes

11/29/2022: Probate Minutes

Order Settling First and Current Account and Report of Trustee

11/29/2022: Order Settling First and Current Account and Report of Trustee

Proof of Mailing

11/29/2022: Proof of Mailing

Probate Minutes

01/31/2023: Probate Minutes

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: The Court will hear from counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Report on Status of Administration; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition to Compel Accounting; Continued from 11/29/22; Petitioner; Attorney: Griffith, David Richard; Respondent; Attorney: LeClerc, Raoul J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Report; Report on Status of Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: Absent objection, the First and Current Account and Report is settled and approved. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Order Settling First and Current Account and Report of Trustee; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Comment: Order Settling First and Current Account and Report of Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; First and Current Account and Report of Trustee and Petition for its Settlement; Notice of Hearing; Notice of Related Case; Probate Minutes; Order Settling First and Current Account and Report of Trustee; Proof of Mailing; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition to Compel Accounting; Continued; Petitioner; Attorney: Griffith, David Richard; Respondent; Attorney: LeClerc, Raoul J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Related Case; Comment: Notice of Related Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAccounting - Subsequent Petition; First and Current Account and Report of Trustee and Petition for its Settlement; Comment: First and Current Account and Report of Trustee and Petition for its Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Probate Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketTentative Ruling - Probate; Comment: The Court will hear from counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAccounting Hearing; Petition to Compel Accounting; Citation Issued as to Cynthia Harvey; Citation Issued as to Danielle LeClerc-Klein; Citation Issued as to Rhonda Brunson; Notice of Hearing; Probate Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Petition to Compel Accounting; Petitioner; Attorney: Griffith, David Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Probate; Notice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Issued; Citation Issued as to Rhonda Brunson; Comment: Citation Issued as to Rhonda Brunson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Issued; Citation Issued as to Danielle LeClerc-Klein; Comment: Citation Issued as to Danielle LeClerc-Klein

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Issued; Citation Issued as to Cynthia Harvey; Comment: Citation Issued as to Cynthia Harvey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetn or Opp - Commence a Proceeding under the Probate Code; Petition to Compel Accounting; Comment: Petition to Compel Accounting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less