This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 13:54:54 (UTC).

County of Butte vs. Latona, Michael J

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 County of Butte filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against Latona, Michael J. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0054

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

Judge Details

Judge

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

County of Butte

Defendant and Respondent

Latona, Michael J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County Department of Child Support Services

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Stipulation for Judgment as to Other Parent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Stipulation for Judgment as to Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Judgment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Comment: Jurisdiction date of 2/2/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 02/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDCSS Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where County of Butte is a litigant