This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/11/2022 at 23:22:46 (UTC).

CONLEY, DAVID E VS ROMSTONE CYCLE CENTER

Case Summary

On 06/15/2015 CONLEY, DAVID E filed an Other lawsuit against ROMSTONE CYCLE CENTER. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P, Mosbarger, Tamara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **4507

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONLEY, DAVID

Defendants

SALEH, LORA JEAN, ESTATE OF

EBER, LARRY

SALEH, RAMEY

ROMSTONE CYCLE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lykken, Michael Ross

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing

11/30/2017: Proof of Mailing

Order

11/27/2017: Order

Order

09/29/2017: Order

Civil Minutes

09/29/2017: Civil Minutes

Case Management Statement

09/27/2017: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

08/10/2017: Proof of Service

Declaration

08/10/2017: Declaration

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

08/10/2017: Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Defendant Lary Eber's Request for Judicial Notice

08/10/2017: Defendant Lary Eber's Request for Judicial Notice

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: Defendant has made a sufficient showing that Plaintiff failed to appear at mandatory settlement conferences, failed to serve his first Amended Complaint on Defendant within the statutory period, and has failed to prosecute his case. Additionally, Defendant's motion is unopposed. The Court, in its discretion, therefore grants Defendant's motion, except as to the request for costs which is denied as vague and unsupported by a declaration identifying and itemizing the costs. The case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court will adjust and sign the order provided by Defendant. The Court will conduct a case management conference at the scheduled time of 10:30am in the event Plaintiff appears for the CMC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Motion - Fee; Defendant Lary Eber's Request for Judicial Notice; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration; Proof of Service; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Continued from 07/28/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Entered in Error; Comment: Why case should not be dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion hearings - Predisposition; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to Dismiss Plaintiff David Conley's Compaint for Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: OF Defendant Lary Eber's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: DECL OF DEFT LARY EBER IN SUPP OF HIS DEMURRER TO [P] COMPLAINT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities; Comment: DEFT'S LARY EBER'S P/A'S IN SUPP OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketFirst Paper Filed - Fee; Comment: DEMURRER FOR (D)LARY EBER-1ST APPEARANCE CK#1256 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 743849 Fee Amount: 435.00 Entry Clerk: MKI 535 - $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED - 8/17/15 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketNotice; Comment: NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING NTC OF WVR OF COURT FEES/ENCLOSED FW-010 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketNotice; Comment: NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING NTC OF ASSIGNMENT & CMC Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Comment: NTC OF ASSIGNMENT & CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED - NO SUMMONS ISSUED (OVER 25K) Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 435.00 Entry Clerk: CLL 534 - $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Comment: APP FOR ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DAVID E CONLEY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less