This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 10:33:28 (UTC).

City of Chico vs All Persons Interested in the Matter of the Issuance and Sale of One or More Series of Pension Obligation Bonds to Refinance Outstanding Obligations of the City of Chico to the Californai Public Employee's Retirement System Under the

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 City of Chico filed an Other lawsuit against All Persons Interested in the Matter of the Issuance and Sale of One or More Series of Pension Obligation Bonds to Refinance Outstanding Obligations of the City of Chico to the Californai Public Employee's Retirement System Under the. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1246

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Chico

Defendants

All Persons Interested in the Matter of the Issuance and Sale of One or More Series of Pension Obligation Bonds to Refinance Outstanding Obligations of the City of Chico to the Californai Public Employee's Retirement System Under the Public Employee'

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wasrzyniak, James Anthony Charles

Fama, David Thomas

Defendant Attorneys

Murray, Laura Elizabeth

Coupal, Jonathan Mark

Bittle, Timothy Arthur

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

07/09/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

07/08/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Howard Jarvis Taxpayer Association's Answer

06/22/2021: Howard Jarvis Taxpayer Association's Answer

Proof of Mailing of Order of Publication of Summons and other Notice in Validation Action

05/19/2021: Proof of Mailing of Order of Publication of Summons and other Notice in Validation Action

Order of Publication of Summons and Other Notice in Validation Action

05/14/2021: Order of Publication of Summons and Other Notice in Validation Action

Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication

05/13/2021: Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication

Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons and Other Notice in Validation Action

05/13/2021: Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons and Other Notice in Validation Action

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Citation Judicial - Issued and Filed

05/13/2021: Summons - Citation Judicial - Issued and Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint for Validation; Summons - Citation Judicial - Issued and Filed; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons and Other Notice in Validation Action; Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication; Order of Publication of Summons and Other Notice in Validation Action; Proof of Mailing of Order of Publication of Summons and other Notice in Validation Action; Howard Jarvis Taxpayer Association's Answer; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal; Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Unlimited; Howard Jarvis Taxpayer Association's Answer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Mailing; Proof of Mailing of Order of Publication of Summons and other Notice in Validation Action; Comment: Proof of Mailing of Order of Publication of Summons and other Notice in Validation Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOrder for Publication or Posting; Order of Publication of Summons and Other Notice in Validation Action; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Comment: Order of Publication of Summons and Other Notice in Validation Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021

DocketProof of Service; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration; Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication; Comment: Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication and Posting of Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEx Parte Application without Hearing; Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons and Other Notice in Validation Action; Comment: Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons and Other Notice in Validation Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons - Citation Judicial - Issued and Filed; Comment: Summons - Citation Judicial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint; Complaint for Validation; Comment: Complaint for Validation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less