This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/09/2021 at 06:01:37 (UTC).

Citibank, N A vs Hanson, Jaylene L

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Citibank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hanson, Jaylene L. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2406

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Butte County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Citibank, N.A.

Citibank, N A

Defendant

Hanson, Jaylene L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Villarreal, Reginaldo

Sherrill, Donald

Henriques, Janalie Ann

DiPiero, Anthony J

Hunt, Michael Scott

Salet, Keri L

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Issued

03/02/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Issued

Notice of Change of Address

02/26/2021: Notice of Change of Address

Request to Enter Default-Entered

02/26/2021: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Declaration of Counsel Re: 1) Interest; 2) Costs; 3) Attorney Fees

02/26/2021: Declaration of Counsel Re: 1) Interest; 2) Costs; 3) Attorney Fees

Default Judgment by Clerk

02/26/2021: Default Judgment by Clerk

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jaylene L Hanson

12/23/2020: Proof of Service of Summons as to Jaylene L Hanson

Summons Issued and Filed

12/09/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/09/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/09/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type; Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names: Citibank, N A; Hanson, Jaylene L; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: Citibank, N A; Judgment Amount: $15,845.72; Awarded Against: Hanson, Jaylene L; Amount; Damages: $15,410.72; Costs: $435.00; Total: $15845.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChange of Address; Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Counsel Re: 1) Interest; 2) Costs; 3) Attorney Fees; Comment: Declaration of Counsel Re: 1) Interest; 2) Costs; 3) Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk; Default Judgment by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Jaylene L Hanson; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Jaylene L Hanson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: Common Counts; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $15410.72; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $370.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 12/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 12/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherrill, Donald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Villarreal, Reginaldo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S