This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 13:46:31 (UTC).

Citibank N A vs Rankin, Chad E

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Citibank N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rankin, Chad E. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0191

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Citibank N A

Citibank NA

Defendant

Rankin, Chad E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sherrill, Donald

Oswald, Harmony N

Henriques, Janalie Ann

DiPiero, Anthony J

Hunt, Michael Scott

Salet, Keri L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/28/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

01/28/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Proof of Service of Summons as to Chad E Rankin

02/09/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to Chad E Rankin

Default Judgment by Clerk

04/09/2021: Default Judgment by Clerk

Declaration of Counsel Re: Interest, Costs, and Attorney Fees

04/09/2021: Declaration of Counsel Re: Interest, Costs, and Attorney Fees

Request to Enter Default-Entered

04/09/2021: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Notice of Change of Address

04/09/2021: Notice of Change of Address

Abstract of Judgment - Issued

04/15/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type; Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names: Citibank NA; Rankin, Chad E; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: Citibank NA; Judgment Amount: $2,209.80; Awarded Against: Rankin, Chad E; Amount; Damages: $1,917.80; Costs: $292.00; Total: $2209.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChange of Address; Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Counsel Re: Interest, Costs, and Attorney Fees; Comment: Declaration of Counsel Re: Interest, Costs, and Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk; Default Judgment by Clerk; Comment: Proposed Judgment/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Chad E Rankin; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Chad E Rankin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: Comon Counts; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $225.0; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $1917.8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 01/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherrill, Donald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENRIQUES JANALIE