This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 05:01:54 (UTC).

Citibank N A vs Iman, Theresa

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Citibank N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Iman, Theresa. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0096

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Butte County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank N A

Defendant

Iman, Theresa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sherrill, Donald

Oswald, Harmony N

Henriques, Janalie Ann

DiPiero, Anthony J

Hunt, Michael Scott

Salet, Keri L

 

Court Documents

Stipulation Agreement

03/19/2021: Stipulation Agreement

Proof of Service of Summons as to Theresa Iman

02/09/2021: Proof of Service of Summons as to Theresa Iman

Summons

01/19/2021: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

01/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; Stipulation Agreement; Comment: Stipulation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Theresa Iman; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Theresa Iman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: Proof of Mailing of Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Cause Of ActionContract; Type: Action; Description: First Cause of Action - Common Counts; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $3375.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 01/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherrill, Donald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S