This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/03/2022 at 06:09:12 (UTC).

Chico Mobile Home Park, LLC vs Estate Of Kathleen M Carlson

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Chico Mobile Home Park, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Estate Of Kathleen M Carlson. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2777

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Chico Mobile Home Park, LLC

Respondent

Estate Of Kathleen M Carlson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tran, Marie C

 

Court Documents

Petition For Judgment To Declare Abandonment Of Mobile Home

11/10/2021: Petition For Judgment To Declare Abandonment Of Mobile Home

Notice of Petition For Judgment Of Abandonment

11/10/2021: Notice of Petition For Judgment Of Abandonment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

01/04/2022: Notice of Hearing

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

01/19/2022: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Petition For Judgment To Declare Abandonment Of Mobile Home

11/10/2021: Petition For Judgment To Declare Abandonment Of Mobile Home

Notice of Petition For Judgment Of Abandonment

11/10/2021: Notice of Petition For Judgment Of Abandonment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

01/04/2022: Notice of Hearing

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

01/19/2022: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference; Petition For Judgment To Declare Abandonment Of Mobile Home; Notice of Petition For Judgment Of Abandonment; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Notice of Hearing; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Re Status of Petition for Abandonment of Mobile Home

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice of Petition For Judgment Of Abandonment; Comment: Notice of Petition For Judgment Of Abandonment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Petition For Judgment To Declare Abandonment Of Mobile Home; Comment: Petition For Judgment To Declare Abandonment Of Mobile Home

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less