This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/26/2023 at 17:00:30 (UTC).

John C Peterson Trustees of the Peterson Family Trust of 2017, dated April 6, 2017 et al vs McConnell, Ronald E et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2023 John C Peterson Trustees of the Peterson Family Trust of 2017, dated April 6, 2017 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against McConnell, Ronald E. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1884

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

John C Peterson Trustees of the Peterson Family Trust of 2017, dated April 6, 2017

Janet K Peterson, Trustee of the Peterson Family Trust of 2017, Dated April 6, 2017

Peterson, John C

Peterson, Janet K

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

McConnell, Ronald E

McConnell, Amy A

United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC

Stewart Title of California

Fennell, David E

Third Federal Savings and Loan Association of Cleveland

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Sandelman, Raymond Louis

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Loving, Roy William

Coutts, Melissa Robbins

Squire, Ryan Christopher

Debbas, Diala G.

Handley, Laurel I

 

Court Documents

Cross Complaint - No Fee

09/28/2023: Cross Complaint - No Fee

Defendant Ronald E McConnell and Amy A McConnell's Answer

09/28/2023: Defendant Ronald E McConnell and Amy A McConnell's Answer

Proof of Service of Summons as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc

09/14/2023: Proof of Service of Summons as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc

Amended Answer and Disclaimer of Interest of Defendant United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC

09/12/2023: Amended Answer and Disclaimer of Interest of Defendant United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC

Third Federal Savings and Loan Association of Cleveland's Answer

08/23/2023: Third Federal Savings and Loan Association of Cleveland's Answer

Proof of Service of Summons as to Stuart Title of California

08/16/2023: Proof of Service of Summons as to Stuart Title of California

Proof of Service of Summons as to David Fennell

08/15/2023: Proof of Service of Summons as to David Fennell

Proof of Service of Summons as to United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC

08/15/2023: Proof of Service of Summons as to United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC

Notice of Pendency of Action

07/31/2023: Notice of Pendency of Action

Proof of Service

08/01/2023: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

08/01/2023: Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Amy A McConnell

08/01/2023: Proof of Service of Summons as to Amy A McConnell

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ronald E McConnell

08/01/2023: Proof of Service of Summons as to Ronald E McConnell

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Third Federal Savings and Loan Association

07/31/2023: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Third Federal Savings and Loan Association

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

07/21/2023: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Complaint

07/13/2023: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

07/13/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/17/2024
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Third Federal Savings and Loan Association; Proof of Service of Summons as to Ronald E McConnell; Proof of Service of Summons as to Amy A McConnell; Proof of Service; Proof of Service; Notice of Pendency of Action; Proof of Service of Summons as to United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC; Proof of Service of Summons as to David Fennell; Proof of Service of Summons as to Stuart Title of California; Third Federal Savings and Loan Association of Cleveland's Answer; Amended Answer and Disclaimer of Interest of Defendant United Wholesale Mortgage, LLC; Proof of Service of Summons as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc; Defendant Ronald E McConnell and Amy A McConnell's Answer; Cross Complaint - No Fee; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems; Ron E McConnell and Amy A McConnell's First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint; First Amendment to Complaint; Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc's Answer; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2023

DocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Plaintiff's Demurrer to Amended Answer to Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketTentative Ruling; Comment: Motion By Plaintiffs For Leave To File a Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Court will sign the Proposed Order.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOrder; Order Granting Motion by Plaintiffs for Leave to File a Second Amendment to Complaint; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Comment: Order Granting Motion by Plaintiffs for Leave to File a Second Amendment to Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion hearings - Predisposition; Notice of Motion by Plaintiffs for Leave to File a Second Amendment to Complaint; Proof of Service; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAmendment to Complaint; First Amendment to Complaint; Comment: First Amendment to Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling; Notice of Entry of Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAmended Answer or Response - No Fee; McConnells' Second Amended Answer; Comment: McConnells' Second Amended Answer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
07/13/2023

Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Intentional Tort; Type: Action; Description: Trespass and Nuisance

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Intentional Tort; Type: Action; Description: Interference with Easement, Nuisance

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Real Property; Type: Action; Description: Quiet Title; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $435.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketCause Of Action; Action Intentional Tort; File Date 07/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketCause Of Action; Action Intentional Tort; File Date 07/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketCause Of Action; Action Real Property; File Date 07/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/25/2023; Served: 07/25/2023; Served: 07/27/2023; Served: 08/08/2023; Served: 08/01/2023; Served: 07/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less