This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/14/2023 at 06:03:10 (UTC).

Butte Credit vs. Gohlke, Daniel J

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 Butte Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gohlke, Daniel J. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1307

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte Credit

Defendant

Gohlke, Daniel J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/16/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

05/16/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

05/16/2023: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

Complaint

05/16/2023: Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

05/18/2023: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons

06/13/2023: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Service of Summons; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Open Book Account

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Indebted; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $5989.25; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $181.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketProof of Service; Served: 06/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration; Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration; Comment: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less