This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/13/2023 at 01:03:35 (UTC).

Butte Credit vs. Waters, Mariah D

Case Summary

On 04/06/2023 Butte Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Waters, Mariah D. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0850

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte Credit

Defendant

Waters, Mariah D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/06/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

04/06/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Declaration Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

04/06/2023: Declaration Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

Complaint

04/06/2023: Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

04/07/2023: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons

05/02/2023: Proof of Service of Summons

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

05/09/2023: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

05/19/2023: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

05/23/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Proof of Service of Summons; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal; Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Money Due; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $1683.91; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $181.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 04/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 04/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction; Comment: Declaration Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less